Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1303 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7692 Week
» 28134 Month
» 364980 Year
» 1586545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24050
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61467   01/03/1952
B16 61464   20/05/1954
B16 61428   23/03/1957
Q7 63465   05/08/1961