Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 136 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7877 Week
» 28319 Month
» 365165 Year
» 1586730 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2557
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2372   12/01/1934
B16 844   06/02/1936
B16 2371   22/04/1938
B16 841   01/08/1941
B16 2382   29/07/1944
Q7 3467   28/11/1947