Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1063 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7453 Week
» 36951 Month
» 373797 Year
» 1595362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1243
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 943   06/1921
B16 930   29/04/1930
Q7 630   10/10/1933
B16 2365   10/11/1936
B16 942   03/08/1940