Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 993 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7383 Week
» 36881 Month
» 373727 Year
» 1595292 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2778
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 930   08/06/1936
Q7 631   22/10/1941
Q7 630   30/08/1944
B16 1425   06/09/1947