Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 514 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1853 Week
» 31351 Month
» 368197 Year
» 1589762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1218
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 936   04/1921
B16 937   18/11/1927
Q7 631   12/02/1931
B16 1384   25/09/1933
B16 840   11/05/1936