Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1223 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7612 Week
» 28054 Month
» 364900 Year
» 1586465 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1631
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 632   30/04/1924
B16 2380   04/06/1934
B16 936   27/11/1936
B16 2378   22/05/1940