Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 560 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 560 Week
» 30058 Month
» 366904 Year
» 1588469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1201
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 931   03/1921
B16 1381   25/08/1932
B16 932   17/12/1934
Q7 633   12/08/1937
B16 2369   24/05/1940