Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 522 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 522 Week
» 30020 Month
» 366866 Year
» 1588431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1634
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 634   08/05/1924
B16 2379   27/05/1933
B16 2377   20/03/1936
B16 842   26/11/1938
B16 937   14/06/1941