Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1288 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7677 Week
» 28119 Month
» 364965 Year
» 1586530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1525
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2380   31/07/1923
B16 1371   09/01/1929
B16 846   22/04/1932
B16 931   14/01/1935
B16 847   01/04/1938
B16 922   19/09/1940
Q7 634   23/06/1943