Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 789 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18592 Week
» 71608 Month
» 191135 Year
» 3217988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2227
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
56 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q5 |
658 |
|
15/08/1929 |
Q5 |
2120 |
|
05/08/1932 |
Q5 |
650 |
|
29/03/1935 |
Q5 |
656 |
|
30/03/1938 |
Q5 |
1150 |
|
27/02/1941 |
Q5 |
771 |
|
02/01/1943 |
Q5 |
1178 |
|
23/11/1944 |
Q5 |
3257 |
|
21/12/1946 |
|