Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 341 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18144 Week
» 71160 Month
» 190687 Year
» 3217540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27015
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60047 |
DONOVAN |
06/12/1950 |
A3 |
60103 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
14/03/1952 |
A3 |
60085 |
MANNA |
29/04/1954 |
A3 |
60059 |
TRACERY |
20/04/1956 |
A3 |
60061 |
PRETTY POLLY |
01/03/1957 |
A3 |
60082 |
NEIL GOW |
21/03/1958 |
A3 |
60089 |
FELSTEAD |
09/10/1959 |
|