Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14093 Week
» 67109 Month
» 186636 Year
» 3213489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27074
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60082 |
NEIL GOW |
28/03/1952 |
A3 |
60103 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
06/04/1954 |
A3 |
60086 |
GAINSBOROUGH |
12/10/1955 |
A3 |
60061 |
PRETTY POLLY |
21/12/1957 |
A3 |
60093 |
CORONACH |
19/12/1958 |
|