Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27047
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60046 |
DIAMOND JUBILEE |
01/06/1951 |
A3 |
60048 |
DONCASTER |
21/09/1954 |
A3 |
60107 |
ROYAL LANCER |
24/08/1956 |
A3 |
60100 |
SPEARMINT |
25/09/1958 |
A3 |
60103 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
09/08/1960 |
A3 |
60106 |
FLYING FOX |
16/06/1962 |
|