Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2717 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16123 Week
» 69139 Month
» 188666 Year
» 3215519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27083
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60107 |
ROYAL LANCER |
03/12/1952 |
A3 |
60042 |
SINGAPORE |
08/09/1956 |
A3 |
60101 |
CICERO |
20/02/1959 |
A3 |
60108 |
GAY CRUSADER |
21/09/1960 |
A3 |
60048 |
DONCASTER |
14/04/1962 |
|