Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16293 Week
» 69309 Month
» 188836 Year
» 3215689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27006
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60090 |
GRAND PARADE |
01/11/1950 |
A3 |
60072 |
SUNSTAR |
23/12/1953 |
A3 |
60077 |
THE WHITE KNIGHT |
28/06/1955 |
A3 |
60090 |
GRAND PARADE |
26/03/1957 |
A3 |
60087 |
BLENHEIM |
12/08/1958 |
A3 |
60073 |
ST GATIEN |
12/02/1960 |
|