Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 723 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14129 Week
» 67145 Month
» 186672 Year
» 3213525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9117/27009
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
2578 |
BAYARDO |
15/06/1940 |
A3 |
2572 |
ST GATIEN |
10/11/1945 |
A3 |
60100 |
SPEARMINT |
13/04/1949 |
A3 |
60070 |
GLADIATEUR |
03/07/1953 |
A3 |
60072 |
SUNSTAR |
07/06/1955 |
A3 |
60096 |
PAPYRUS |
23/07/1958 |
A3 |
60112 |
ST SIMON |
25/02/1960 |
|