Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1006 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4605 Week
» 10739 Month
» 238623 Year
» 1460188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #845
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5046   06/04/1935
A5 5024   31/10/1942
A5 5168   01/01/1944
A5 9800   03/08/1946