Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1597
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5166   09/02/1924
A5 5045   25/07/1931
A5 5169   16/09/1933
A5 5129   01/04/1939