Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 556 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 7789 Month
» 235673 Year
» 1457238 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #557
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5166   30/05/1931
A5 5003   14/04/1934
A5 5168   30/05/1936
A5 5371   02/10/1937
A5 5372   15/04/1939
A5 5006   22/11/1941