Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 490 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4228 Week
» 1741 Month
» 229625 Year
» 1451190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #719
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5128   17/07/1926
A5 5167   15/07/1933
A5 5168   02/07/1938
A5 5166   31/03/1945