Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 649 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4248 Week
» 10382 Month
» 238266 Year
» 1459831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #392
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 45   07/04/1923
A5 5168   24/10/1931
A5 5167   22/04/1939
A5 5451   29/11/1941