Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 581 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1680 Week
» 7814 Month
» 235698 Year
» 1457263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #984
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5170   06/12/1930
A5 5374   20/10/1934
A5 5128   17/10/1936
A5 5158   04/06/1938
A5 5168   27/04/1940
A5 5128   24/10/1942
A5 5167   14/10/1944
A5 9826   10/08/1946
A5 69802   10/12/1949