Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 547 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4285 Week
» 1798 Month
» 229682 Year
» 1451247 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #168
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5088   18/01/1936
A5 5168   21/08/1937
A5 5024   22/10/1938
A5 5169   01/03/1941
A5 5030   20/01/1945