Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 335 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7342 Week
» 13476 Month
» 241360 Year
» 1462925 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #396
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 88   12/05/1923
A5 5030   20/04/1935
A5 5411   22/05/1937
A5 5373   02/09/1939
A5 5168   05/09/1942