Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 450 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1549 Week
» 7683 Month
» 235567 Year
» 1457132 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #843
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5003   19/05/1928
A5 5373   09/06/1934
A5 5448   02/12/1939
A5 5449   31/01/1942
A5 5003   15/01/1944
A5 9803   25/05/1946