Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1240 Today
» 1219 Yesterday
» 3750 Week
» 35539 Month
» 184304 Year
» 1405869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1843
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 129   28/02/1920
A5 5006   08/12/1928
A5 5169   14/05/1932
A5 5411   14/10/1933