Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 278 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2185 Week
» 20967 Month
» 269260 Year
» 1153641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1533
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 128   21/12/1912
A5 170   09/11/1918
A5 5129   28/04/1928
A5 5007   28/11/1931