Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1683
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 371   30/06/1917
A5 448   09/06/1923
A5 5373   30/08/1930
A5 5451   23/06/1934