Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #210
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5449   06/04/1940
A5 5023   18/04/1942
A5 5371   22/01/1944
A5 5450   14/04/1945
A5 9823   05/07/1947
A5 69824   13/11/1948