Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 37 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 1215 Week
» 1215 Month
» 190350 Year
» 1411915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #395
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 46   28/04/1923
A5 5156   24/08/1929
A5 5129   14/11/1931
A5 5411   22/02/1936
A5 5156   12/06/1937