Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3854
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5007   20/06/1942
A5 5411   22/04/1944
A5 9827   10/08/1946
A5 69814   24/07/1948