Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3850
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 18
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
A5 5373   30/05/1942
A5 5154   24/06/1944
A5 9828   01/02/1947
A5 69815   31/07/1948