Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1202 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7591 Week
» 28033 Month
» 364879 Year
» 1586444 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1559
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1373   19/10/1923
B16 920   04/10/1928
B16 2380   16/11/1931
B16 909   20/07/1934
B16 932   28/07/1937
B16 840   02/02/1940
B16 1381   27/12/1941