Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1288 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7677 Week
» 28119 Month
» 364965 Year
» 1586530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2728
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 842   27/12/1935
B16 1379   23/11/1938
B16 840   18/11/1941
B16 942   08/12/1945
B16 61421   15/01/1949