Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1056 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7446 Week
» 36944 Month
» 373790 Year
» 1595355 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2560
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 906   11/01/1934
B16 2370   20/06/1936
B16 906   21/03/1939
B16 930   11/10/1941
B16 840   11/08/1945