Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 110 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5218 Week
» 34716 Month
» 371562 Year
» 1593127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1587
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1381   04/12/1923
B16 925   18/01/1930
B16 842   20/01/1933
B16 2379   21/01/1936
B16 844   29/03/1938