Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1052 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7442 Week
» 36940 Month
» 373786 Year
» 1595351 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2881
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 915   20/03/1937
B16 2365   29/06/1940
B16 843   30/01/1943
B16 842   22/09/1945
B16 61432   10/12/1948