Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1091 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7481 Week
» 36979 Month
» 373825 Year
» 1595390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2266
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 923   18/05/1932
B16 849   07/02/1936
B16 920   08/02/1941
B16 936   08/08/1945
B16 61402   01/10/1948