Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7483 Week
» 36981 Month
» 373827 Year
» 1595392 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1141
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 922   11/1920
B16 937   30/08/1932
B16 1381   18/10/1934
B16 1375   14/01/1937
B16 909   11/05/1940