Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1067 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7456 Week
» 27898 Month
» 364744 Year
» 1586309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24031
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61419   22/09/1951
B16 61424   11/12/1954
B16 61435   06/07/1957
B16 61412   02/02/1960