Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1045 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7435 Week
» 36933 Month
» 373779 Year
» 1595344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3055/24024
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2373   16/02/1940
B16 911   27/11/1942
B16 915   06/04/1946
B16 61424   21/09/1949
B16 61460   11/10/1952
B16 61414   28/05/1955
B16 61416   19/09/1959