Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1069 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7458 Week
» 27900 Month
» 364746 Year
» 1586311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1138
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 921   10/1920
B16 915   22/03/1928
B16 934   10/08/1933
B16 1373   22/05/1936
B16 1383   09/07/1938