Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1215 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7604 Week
» 28046 Month
» 364892 Year
» 1586457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3049
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 926   23/03/1940
B16 2364   16/03/1943
B16 1372   04/05/1946
B16 61418   27/08/1948