Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1235 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7624 Week
» 28066 Month
» 364912 Year
» 1586477 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24017
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61455   15/03/1951
B16 61461   22/08/1953
B16 61418   05/06/1956
B16 61454   12/12/1958