Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1203 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7592 Week
» 28034 Month
» 364880 Year
» 1586445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24009
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61461   16/03/1951
B16 61448   10/10/1953
B16 61444   21/03/1956
B16 61418   14/08/1958
B16 61421   10/11/1961