Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1239 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7628 Week
» 28070 Month
» 364916 Year
» 1586481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2694/24032
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2371   29/11/1935
B16 2376   27/04/1938
B16 1382   28/12/1940
B16 927   15/04/1944
B16 1436   28/09/1946
B16 61447   15/12/1949
B16 61430   11/11/1954