Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1054 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7444 Week
» 36942 Month
» 373788 Year
» 1595353 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1556
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1372   19/10/1923
B16 2381   07/02/1933
B16 933   17/07/1936
B16 943   04/06/1941
B16 930   06/01/1945