Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 420 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1759 Week
» 31257 Month
» 368103 Year
» 1589668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1480
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2372   17/04/1923
B16 1373   17/06/1931
B16 2367   02/03/1934
B16 2380   21/10/1936
B16 1381   10/08/1939