Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7451 Week
» 36949 Month
» 373795 Year
» 1595360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3505/24029
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1384   27/10/1944
B16 1449   14/02/1947
B16 61444   11/11/1949
B16 61418   13/03/1954
B16 61467   14/08/1956
B16 61464   08/01/1959
B16 61437   19/08/1961