Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 469 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1568 Week
» 7702 Month
» 235586 Year
» 1457151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3334
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5408   18/06/1938
O4 5966   22/06/1940
O4 5387   05/12/1942
O4 5417   29/09/1945
O4 63765   28/03/1948